Financial history NTC TOURING THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 509251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £208.47k £192.94k £183.94k £246.23k £169.78k
Total expenditure £184.88k £580.29k £227.98k £230.60k £91.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £101.56k £65.00k £65.00k £79.00k £34.14k