Accounts and annual returns THE FUSILIER MUSEUM LONDON

Charity number: 1171068
Charity reporting is up to date (120 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 February 2024 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 February 2024 120 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 February 2023 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 February 2023 106 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window