Financial history THE FUSILIER MUSEUM LONDON

Charity number: 1171068
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £124.89k £130.76k £100.02k £40.46k £62.07k
Total expenditure £145.13k £150.78k £132.52k £99.76k £69.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A