Financial history THE HARBOUR PROJECT FOR SWINDON REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS

Charity number: 1171368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £332.28k £209.23k £209.58k £271.86k £334.87k
Total expenditure £169.13k £216.79k £206.22k £262.12k £297.06k
Income from government contracts £33.00k £33.00k £36.00k £33.00k £58.96k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.97k £4.68k