Financial history ST MICHAELS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1171326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £105.99k £53.87k £63.21k £94.02k £61.34k
Total expenditure £118.51k £20.69k £31.59k £75.29k £45.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £53.37k £1.63k £5.32k £46.76k £18.19k