Morton Hall Visitors Group

Charity number: 1174056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download