Financial history THE CATHOLIC CHILDREN'S SOCIETY (SHREWSBURY DIOCESE) INC

Charity number: 509793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £175.15k £152.00k £122.70k £76.09k £71.95k
Total expenditure £146.99k £160.94k £144.76k £72.79k £82.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A