CROESO TEIFI

Charity number: 1173014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 February 2021 01 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 February 2021 01 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 08 February 2020 01 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 February 2020 01 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 08 February 2019 10 January 2020 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 February 2019 10 January 2020 33 days late Download
Annual return 08 February 2018 27 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 February 2018 27 October 2018 On time Download