THE ANGLESEY AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 510048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £522.27k £557.34k £569.88k £456.04k £110.58k
Total expenditure £492.76k £516.51k £531.30k £496.81k £173.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £71.85k £6.74k £15.25k
Income - Donations and legacies £768 £1.82k £4.10k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £470.83k £489.11k £492.03k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £6 £2 £8 N/A N/A
Income - Other £50.67k £66.40k £73.75k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £492.29k £515.31k £529.11k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £322 £350 £848 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £3.05k £2.78k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £150 £850 £1.34k N/A N/A