BRECON ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 510226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline Russell Boarer Trustee 26 November 2020 None on record
Keith Lawson Trustee 01 March 2021 None on record
JULIAN RABJOHN Trustee None on record
Sally Palmer Chair 22 October 2020 None on record
Nicolette Kay Alderslade Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
Councillor Robert Leonard Thomas Trustee 27 September 2017 None on record
David Burden Trustee 10 January 2021 None on record
ANN LOUSTALAN Trustee None on record
JOHN JAMES PRICE Trustee
LLANGORSE COMMON COMMUNITY TOILETS Received: On time