Financial history DURHAM/NORTHUMBERLAND WING ATC WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1175149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £125.29k £129.87k £123.04k £11.53k £49.69k
Total expenditure £106.47k £133.73k £101.69k £40.13k £38.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A