Trustees DURHAM/NORTHUMBERLAND WING ATC WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1175149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN NESBITT Chair 10 April 2019
None on record
Tracey Karen Rowell Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
David Middleton Trustee 16 February 2021
None on record
Christopher Miller Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record
Ian Frazer Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record
DAVID BUTTON Trustee 10 April 2019
None on record
THOMAS ANTHONY BARGEWELL Trustee 11 April 2018
None on record