Accounts and annual returns MADE WITH MUSIC

Charity number: 1177738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window