Accounts and annual returns THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN WYTHENSHAWE

Charity number: 1181489
Charity reporting is overdue by 264 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 264 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 264 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window