THE SOCIETY OF ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE

Charity number: 1177459
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 13 May 2021 13 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 01 July 2020 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 01 July 2020 62 days late Download