Financial history THREE COUNTIES AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 511868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £5.72m £5.89m £6.82m £1.52m £3.38m
Total expenditure £5.51m £5.67m £5.99m £2.67m £3.86m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £456.71k £287.82k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.29k £550 £850.50k £320.32k £18.74k
Income - Other trading activities £298.20k £288.24k £298.58k £76.38k £453.00k
Income - Charitable activities £3.91m £4.19m £4.27m £292.51k £1.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £20.80k £29.16k £32.43k £24.13k £27.23k
Income - Other £1.48m £1.38m £1.37m £810.15k £1.52m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £840.00k £318.49k £18.74k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.29m £4.50m £4.74m £2.06m £2.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £270.88k £263.21k £278.11k £260.40k £711.94k
Expenditure - Governance £101.59k £76.58k £86.63k £76.58k £70.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £75.63k £12.50k £38.50k
Expenditure - Investment management £6.06k £6.78k £7.00k £6.99k £7.95k
Expenditure - Other £950.47k £915.18k £964.03k £348.57k £1.05m