Accounts and annual returns HUNTINGDON & PETERBOROUGH FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES (CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION)

Charity number: 1178059
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 22 November 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 22 November 2021 53 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 13 November 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 13 November 2020 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 02 November 2019 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 02 November 2019 33 days late Download Open in new window