Accounts and annual returns THE VENTURERS NORFOLK BROADS CRUISE

Charity number: 1180463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 05 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 05 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 05 February 2022 311 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 05 February 2022 311 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 22 March 2021 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 22 March 2021 356 days late Download Open in new window