ISLE ACCESS

Charity number: 1178395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 18 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 18 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 11 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 11 August 2019 On time Download