CREWE AND NANTWICH GYMNASTICS AND COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES CENTRE

Charity number: 512109
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 29 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 July 2017 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 07 July 2017 7 days late Download