WIRRAL GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS,AFFILIATED TO THE INSTITUTE OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS LTD

Charity number: 512232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.72k £4.27k £5.80k £4.91k £3.36k
Total expenditure £4.94k £5.70k £5.21k £6.36k £1.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A