Financial history THE PERSHORE AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.07k £1.54k £2.36k £1.08k £627
Total expenditure £2.90k £1.60k £2.03k £976 £1.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A