Trustees THE PERSHORE AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 512334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Tony Rowley | Chair | 20 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Yvonne McKeon | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Margaret Belcher | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ANTONY BOND | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Sue Morris | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDSEY SARAH STONE | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|||||
DAPHNE HELEN GLOVER | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN MAY | Trustee | 10 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MARGARET MAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.