LYTHAM ST ANNES PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 513963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required