1ST CHINLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 514718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 03 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 03 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required