Financial history THE DERBYSHIRE SINGERS

Charity number: 516921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £48.38k £45.24k £50.46k £26.94k £3.01k
Total expenditure £47.49k £36.92k £53.14k £25.63k £4.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A