Trustees THE DERBYSHIRE SINGERS

Charity number: 516921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAULINE ELIZABETH HOLDEN Chair
None on record
Elizabeth Cramp Trustee 01 September 2022
APART OF ME
Recently registered
Helen Greer Trustee 08 February 2021
None on record
Angela Read Trustee 08 February 2021
None on record
Jonathon Francis Trustee 08 February 2021
None on record
Lesley Butcher Trustee 14 January 2020
None on record
Paul Anthony Thompson Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Shelley Anne Towe Trustee 12 February 2019
None on record
Christine Baker Trustee 29 January 2018
None on record
Helen Mary Stafford Trustee 27 January 2015
None on record