Accounts and annual returns THE NORTH AND EAST YORKSHIRE MARK BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 517013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 03 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 28 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required