Accounts and annual returns CROOKHALL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 517204
Charity reporting is up to date (212 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 May 2022 212 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 November 2018 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 March 2018 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required