Financial history FILEY UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 517293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £50.09k £30.04k £37.51k £51.60k £25.72k
Total expenditure £38.95k £39.37k £35.91k £60.87k £8.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A