Trustees FILEY UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 517293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Hopkinson Chair 01 October 2016
None on record
Ken Lomas Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Andrew Garside Trustee 09 March 2015
None on record
Diana Shaw Trustee 10 February 2015
None on record
Louise Douglas Trustee 02 March 2004
None on record
NICHOLAS INGHAM Trustee
None on record