Financial history THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND

Charity number: 517306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £97.98k £107.64k £107.49k £105.03k £84.35k
Total expenditure £100.53k £100.31k £108.77k £67.15k £98.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A