Accounts and annual returns THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND

Charity number: 517306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 24 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 06 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 02 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 02 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 29 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window