Trustees THE SIR BARRY JACKSON COUNTY FUND

Charity number: 517306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER STEPHEN BURMAN CBE Chair 10 October 2000
SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time
MICHAEL JOHN HIBBS Trustee 27 January 2022
BIRMINGHAM REPERTORY THEATRE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE DANCEXCHANGE LIMITED
Received: On time
SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time
Amelia Rose Ladbrook Trustee 10 June 2019
SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time
GRAHAM JAMES SAUNDERS Trustee 20 October 2016
SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time
LINDA MORGAN Trustee 12 January 2015
SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time
PROFESSOR CLAIRE ELIZABETH COCHRANE Trustee 05 November 2013
None on record
BARRY BOWLES Trustee 16 October 2012
GOSPEL OAK COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time
DEBORAH MARY SHAW Trustee 27 October 2009
SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time
IAN AYLIFFE KING Trustee 21 October 2004
SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time
ANTHONY CHORLEY Trustee 10 October 2000
SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID BURMAN EDGAR Trustee 10 October 2000
SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time
GRAHAM WINTERINGHAM Trustee 10 October 2000
SIR BARRY JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time