1ST HENSINGHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £24.00k £31.98k £34.78k £36.02k £31.14k
Total expenditure £27.24k £23.09k £38.51k £30.78k £31.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A