1ST HENSINGHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALFRED BRANCH Trustee 18 November 2012 None on record
KAM MUI MASSEY Trustee None on record
Clare Louise Bethwaite Trustee 28 September 2018 None on record
Jonathan Edward Cheesewright Trustee 14 October 2016 None on record
Gemma Susan Pattinson Trustee 28 September 2018 None on record
Jennifer Walker Trustee 11 October 2019 None on record
Louise hodgson Trustee 29 September 2018 None on record
Lisa Michelle Stanaway Trustee 04 April 2016 None on record
Ann Ruth Walkingshaw Chair 07 July 2015 None on record