Financial history ACCRINGTON AND DISTRICT UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 521003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.77k £31.90k £13.65k £19.06k £64.83k
Total expenditure £6.01k £5.79k £9.68k £37.41k £24.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £36.67k