Accounts and annual returns CARTMEL FELL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 521066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required