Financial history CARTMEL FELL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 521066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.88k £5.45k £6.98k £14.25k £24.12k
Total expenditure £5.44k £5.78k £4.23k £1.70k £23.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £19.19k