Trustees CARTMEL FELL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 521066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HELEN KATHERINE TODD Chair 28 May 2013
None on record
Linda Hodgson Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
James Longden Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Michael Littlewood Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Mike Elliott Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Laura Martin Trustee 20 January 2020
None on record
Jennifer Ruth Darley Trustee 12 May 2015
None on record
Julie Balshaw Trustee 12 May 2015
None on record
Josephine Sarah Viney Trustee 06 May 2014
None on record
MICHAEL JAMES SMITH Trustee
BRYAN BECK ESTATE
Received: On time
RUTH ELIZABETH SMITH Trustee
THE CARTMEL FELL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOHN RICHARD WOOD Trustee
THE CARTMEL FELL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FRANK JOSEPH MILLS Trustee
None on record