Financial history WIGAN DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 521705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £55.34k £55.24k £66.94k £56.98k £57.77k
Total expenditure £55.50k £52.53k £50.70k £68.16k £44.35k
Income from government contracts £250 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £600 £500 £750 £750 £25.35k