Trustees 4TH COALVILLE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Jones Chair 25 July 2021
None on record
Chris Roberts Trustee 04 July 2021
None on record
Rachael Hollingsworth Trustee 04 July 2021
None on record
Rachael Bradley Trustee 04 July 2021
None on record
Martin Farrar Trustee 18 March 2021
ASHBY AND COALVILLE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: 3 days late
1ST THRINGSTONE SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
1ST DONISTHORPE SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Louise Bailey Trustee 17 November 2020
None on record
Shaun Gooch Trustee 22 September 2017
None on record