Trustees TELFORD UNIT 405 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 522580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michelle Meeson-White Chair 31 October 2013
None on record
Simon Andrew Ashbourne Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Siobhan Jade May Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Emma Soeli Mapp Trustee 03 December 2019
None on record
Alison Upton Trustee 27 September 2018
None on record
THE REVEREND BERTRAM SHINTON Trustee 14 September 2017
PRITCHARDS EDUCATIONAL GIFTS
Received: On time
ANNE POWELL MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
Marion Purcell Trustee 07 April 2016
None on record
CHRISTINE LYNDA PAYNE Trustee
None on record