Accounts and annual returns SOUTH YORKSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 523546
Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 February 2023 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 February 2023 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window