Trustees SOUTH YORKSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 523546
Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Neil Wade Chair 03 November 2013
None on record
Trevor Polson Trustee 07 September 2022
None on record
Michael Paul Firth Trustee 20 October 2021
None on record
Simon Dennis Daley Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Verity Jayne Kemp Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Majid Khan Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Ashley Andrew Horsley Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Simon Peter Alliott Trustee 11 September 2019
BARNSLEY AND DISTRICT DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
BARNSLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Overdue by 76 days
THE COMMON ALLOTMENTS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CUTLER (SILKSTONE) AND OTHER CHARITIES
Received: On time
TOWN SCHOOL FOUNDATION WITH CLARKSON'S ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
Andrew John McAteer Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
PAUL MERCER Trustee 05 September 2018
131ST SHEFFIELD (GRENOSIDE) GUIDES
Received: On time
14TH GRENOSIDE SCOUTS
Overdue by 76 days
Dr Neil Gordon McKay Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
Dani Barrow Trustee 06 September 2017
None on record
Megan Duffield Trustee 06 September 2017
None on record
Fiona Maria Lampitt Trustee 11 September 2013
None on record