ALWOODLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 523749
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 November 2016 On time Download