Trustees ALWOODLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 523749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Hipshon Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Helen Stapleton Trustee 16 May 2017
None on record
Alison Jane Taylor Trustee 19 May 2015
None on record
James Ritchie Kilner Trustee 19 May 2014
None on record
Pamela Godward Trustee 19 May 2014
None on record
SALLY HARRIS Trustee 16 October 2012
None on record
SIMON TAYLOR Trustee 16 October 2012
None on record
AUDREY MARY HIRST Trustee 10 October 2011
None on record
ROB HUNTER Trustee
ALWOODLEY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
ALAN PATRICK Trustee
None on record
ANN CURTIS PEARCE Trustee
None on record
IAN DAVID HAMILTON Trustee
None on record
SARA MARGARET HAMILTON Trustee
None on record