Financial history ALWOODLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 523749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £48.23k £45.46k £61.78k £46.80k £40.38k
Total expenditure £47.94k £39.55k £59.41k £55.67k £27.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £2.42k £26.78k