SWILLINGTON MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523963
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required