SWILLINGTON MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523963
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.80k £33.39k £43.50k £46.08k £41.71k
Total expenditure £40.00k £38.72k £47.16k £35.34k £35.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £10.00k